EP4044842 - VAPORIZER DEVICE MICROFLUIDIC SYSTEMS AND APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juul Labs, Inc. 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATKINS, Ariel 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 02 /
BELISLE, Christopher L. 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 03 /
CHRISTENSEN, Steven 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 04 /
HOOPAI, Alexander M. 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 05 /
JOHNSON, Eric Joseph 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 06 /
KING, Jason 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 07 /
LEON DUQUE, Esteban 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 08 /
RIOS, Matthew 560 20th Street, Building 104 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 09 /
ROSSER, Christopher James Cambridge, CB4 0DW / GB | 10 /
STRATTON, Andrew J. Cambridge, CB4 0DW / GB | 11 /
THAWER, Alim Cambridge, CB4 0DW / GB | 12 /
WESTLEY, James P. Cambridge, CB4 0DW / GB | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Thum & Partner Thum Mötsch Weickert Patentanwälte PartG mbB Siebertstr. 6 81675 München / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20797357.9 | 14.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020US55622 | Priority number, date | US201962915005P | 14.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962915005 P | US201916656360 | 17.10.2019 Original published format: US201916656360 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021076657 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4044842 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/10, A24F40/46, A24F40/48 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
A24F40/48 (EP,KR);
A24F40/40 (GB);
A24F40/10 (EP,GB,KR);
A24F40/42 (KR);
A24F40/44 (KR);
A24F40/46 (EP,KR);
A24F40/485 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE SYSTEME EINER VERDAMPFERVORRICHTUNG UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/34] | English: | VAPORIZER DEVICE MICROFLUIDIC SYSTEMS AND APPARATUSES | [2022/34] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET APPAREILS MICROFLUIDIQUES DE DISPOSITIF DE VAPORISATEUR | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 07.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6084616 (NAKATA YOSHIE [JP], et al); | [A]US2002186283 (SMITH GILBERT G [US], et al); | [A]US9146246 (BATTRELL C FREDERICK [US], et al); | [XA]WO2017093535 (JT INT SA [CH]); | [A]US2017367402 (LAU RAYMOND [US], et al); | [A]CN108158039 (CHINA TOBACCO YUNNAN IND CO LTD) |