EP3965455 - MULTI-CELL CONFIGURATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM, TERMINAL AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spreadtrum Communications (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. Spreadtrum Center, Building 1 Lane 2288, Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Lifeng Postbox No. 5, Spreadtrum Center, Building No. 1 Lane 2288, Zuchongzhi Road, Zhangjiang Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Nordmeyer, Philipp Werner df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20798145.7 | 13.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020CN84381 | Priority number, date | CN201910355752 | 29.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910355752 | [2022/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020220978 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965455 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3965455 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/06, H04L1/08, H04W76/15, H04W60/04, H04W76/11, H04W76/38 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H04L1/06 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L41/0803 (CN);
H04W60/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/23] | H04W24/02, H04W28/16, H04L1/02, H04L1/08, H04L1/18, H04W28/02, H04W28/08, H04W28/18, H04W28/20, H04W28/22, H04W28/24, H04W76/10, H04W76/11, H04W76/15, H04W76/16, H04W76/25, H04W76/27, H04W76/19 | ||
Former IPC [2022/10] | H04W24/02, H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MULTIZELLENKONFIGURATION, SPEICHERMEDIUM, ENDGERÄT UND BASISSTATION | [2022/10] | English: | MULTI-CELL CONFIGURATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, STORAGE MEDIUM, TERMINAL AND BASE STATION | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONFIGURATION DE MULTIPLES CELLULES, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE, TERMINAL ET STATION DE BASE | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2021 | Translation filed | 29.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 12.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014056243 (PELLETIER GHYSLAIN [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0166] - [0171] *; | [Y]US2016219475 (KIM JAE HEUNG [KR]) [Y] 2-7,9-15 * paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0183] * * paragraph [0247] * * paragraph [0328] * * paragraph [0389] * * paragraph [0406] * * paragraphs [0450] , [ 451] * * paragraph [0601] *; | [XY]US2018213452 (KIM DONGGUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraphs [0322] - [0324] * * paragraph [0392] * * paragraph [0408] * * paragraphs [0165] , [ 169] * * paragraphs [0453] - [0467] * * paragraph [0262] * * paragraphs [0380] , [0382] * * paragraph [0540] * * paragraph [0567] * * paragraph [0581] * * paragraphs [0359] - [0361] * * paragraph [0447] * * paragraph [0481] * [Y] 2-7,9-15; | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on PDCP duplication in L2 parameters", vol. RAN WG2, no. Busan, Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180511), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1808423 CLARIFICATION ON PDCP DUPLICATION IN L2 PARAMETER, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F102/Docs/R2%2D1808423%2Ezip, (20180511), XP051519819 [A] 1-15 * §2 * | International search | [A]CN105101388 (ALCATEL LUCENT, et al) [A] 1-23 * entire document *; | [A]CN105814957 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-23 * entire document *; | [X]CN105917716 (SHARP KK) [X] 1-23 * description paragraphs 60-80, claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO2016190639 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-23 * entire document *; | [A]CN107925959 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-23 * entire document *; | [A] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Corrections on reestablishment and security procedures", 3GPP TSG-RAN2 Meeting #103, R2-1816019, (20181012), doi:20200702112914A, XP051525210 [A] 1-23 * entire document * |