EP3962662 - IN SITU LINER PRODUCTION SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiinns Foodtech Ltd. 24 Arbel Street 2514700 Kfar Vradim / IL | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | For all designated states Kiinns Goodtech Ltd. 24 Arbel Street 2514700 Kfar Vradim / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURMAN, Ehud 5 HaTe'ena Street 3686405 Nesher / IL | 02 /
FURMAN, Tzvika 24 Arbel Street 2514700 Kfar Vradim / IL | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Turner, Craig Robert, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Octagon Point 5 Cheapside London EC2V 6AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20798888.2 | 26.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020IL50467 | Priority number, date | US201962839814P | 29.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962839814 P | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020222227 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3962662 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05B13/04, C23C4/12, C09D5/00, B05B12/12, B05B13/06, B05D1/02, B05D3/06, B08B1/00, B08B7/00 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
B05B13/0636 (EP,IL,US);
B05D1/02 (EP,IL,US);
B05B12/084 (US);
B05B12/122 (EP,IL);
B05D3/067 (EP,IL,US);
B08B1/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | B05B13/04, C23C4/12, C09D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR IN-SITU-HERSTELLUNG VON AUSKLEIDUNGEN | [2022/10] | English: | IN SITU LINER PRODUCTION SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2022/10] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE REVÊTEMENT IN SITU | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 21.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005255249 (SCHLATTERBECK DIRK [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11 * the whole document *; | [XAI]WO2010127738 (HUNTSMAN ADV MAT SWITZERLAND [CH], et al) [X] 1,7-11 * the whole document * [A] 13,14 [I] 12; | [A]US2015258768 (BERNHARD BENLY [DK], et al) [A] 1,10* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4320699 (BINKS CHESTER J) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [XY]US6174932 (PACHL JEFFREY T [US], et al) [X] 1, 5, 6, 10 * entire document entire document * [Y] 2-4, 7-9, 11-14; | [A]US2007289965 (GREENFIELD LAWRENCE [US]) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [A]CN104841593 (CMA WUHU ROBOTICS CO LTD) [A] 1-14* entire documnet *; | [Y]US2016083829 (REID THOMAS ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 3, 4 * entire document *; | [A]US2016244212 (DESTAL DELPHINE [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016286796 (LU HELEN S M [US], et al) [Y] 7-9, 11-14 * entire document *; | [A]CN108130506 (YONGCHUN COUNTY QINGWANG FOOD CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * entire document * | by applicant | WO2017125913 |