EP3963892 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INTERACTION BETWEEN INTRA PREDICTION MODE AND BLOCK DIFFERENTIAL PULSE-CODE MODULATION MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Xin c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
LI, Xiang c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
ZHAO, Liang c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 04 /
LIU, Shan c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20798968.2 | 30.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020US30649 | Priority number, date | US201962841003P | 30.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962841003 P | US202016862221 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: US202016862221 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020223449 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963892 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/11, H04N19/157, H04N19/176, H04N19/186, H04N19/196, H04N11/04 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H04N11/046 (EP,CN);
H04N19/11 (EP,CN,KR);
H04N19/619 (US);
H04N19/157 (EP,CN);
H04N19/159 (KR);
H04N19/176 (EP,CN);
H04N19/186 (EP,CN,KR);
H04N19/196 (EP,CN);
H04N19/593 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | H04N19/593, H04N19/91 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INTERAKTION ZWISCHEN EINEM INTRAPRÄDIKTIONSMODUS UND EINEM BLOCKDIFFERENZ-PULSCODE-MODULATIONSMODUS | [2022/10] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INTERACTION BETWEEN INTRA PREDICTION MODE AND BLOCK DIFFERENTIAL PULSE-CODE MODULATION MODE | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UNE INTERACTION ENTRE UN MODE DE PRÉDICTION INTRA ET UN MODE DE MODULATION DE CODE D'IMPULSION DIFFÉRENTIEL DE BLOC | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 05.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2020219512 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | International search | [Y]US2010206016 (BAE SANG HUN [KR], et al); | [A]US2015016515 (NACCARI MATTEO [GB], et al); | [Y]US2016227221 (LAI WANG LIN [US], et al); | [A]US2018324420 (WANG MIAOHUI [CN], et al) |