EP4072306 - CARTRIDGE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING A FROZEN CONFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOUSSE, Fabien, Frédéric, Raymond, Marie Unilever R&D Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | 02 /
SHERWOOD, Paul, Leonard Unilever R&D Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20799704.0 | 03.11.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020EP80737 | Priority number, date | EP20190215398 | 11.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19215398 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021115683 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072306 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4072306 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/28, B65D3/16, B65D83/00, B65D85/78, B65D3/18 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
A23G9/28 (EP);
A23G9/283 (EP);
A23G9/288 (EP);
B65D3/18 (EP);
B65D83/0033 (EP);
B65D85/78 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | KARTUSCHE, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSGABE EINES GEFRORENEN KONFEKTS | [2022/42] | English: | CARTRIDGE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DISPENSING A FROZEN CONFECTION | [2022/42] | French: | CARTOUCHE, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION D'UNE CONFISERIE CONGELÉE | [2023/10] |
Former [2022/42] | CARTOUCHE, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONFISERIE GLACÉE | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 22.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | MC | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | LU | 03.11.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
LU | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
MC | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP0995685 (WELLS ANDREW MICHAEL [GB]) [YD] 1-11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-13 *; | [Y]US6371335 (MACEWEN GEORGE EDWARD [US]) [Y] 1-11* column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP0995685 | US2002119221 | WO2013124193 |