EP4051920 - TORQUE LIMITER WITH A ROTATIONAL AXIS FOR A DRIVE TRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestraße 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUFMANN, Romain 4, Rue d'Uttenhoffen 67110 Gundershoffen / FR | 02 /
RUSCH, Alain 18 rue des Chanvriers 67760 Gambsheim / FR | 03 /
KESSLER, Michael Alter Winzerkeller 5 77815 Bühl / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20799988.9 | 15.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020DE100893 | Priority number, date | DE201910129145 | 29.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019129145 | [2022/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021083453 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051920 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16D7/02, F16F15/00 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
F16D7/025 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F16F15/1292 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F16D2013/642 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | DREHMOMENTBEGRENZER MIT EINER ROTATIONSACHSE FÜR EINEN ANTRIEBSSTRANG | [2022/36] | English: | TORQUE LIMITER WITH A ROTATIONAL AXIS FOR A DRIVE TRAIN | [2022/36] | French: | LIMITEUR DE COUPLE DOTÉ D'UN AXE DE ROTATION POUR UNE TRANSMISSION | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 30.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB1178756 (BORG WARNER [US]); | [DXA]JP2008303995 (AISIN SEIKI); | [XI]WO2018109129 (VALEO OTOMOTIV SANAYI VE TICARET A S [TR]) |