EP4127960 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED INTERVENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | 15.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOYNE, Neil Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 20800470.5 | 12.10.2020 | [2023/06] | WO2020US55234 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022081128 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4127960 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/28 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
G06F16/288 (EP);
G06F21/56 (US);
G06F2221/034 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR AUTOMATISIERTE INTERVENTIONEN | [2023/06] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED INTERVENTION | [2023/06] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'INTERVENTION AUTOMATISÉE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 26.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2016187437 (24/7 CUSTOMER INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0053] ** paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0066] *; | [I]US2018308026 (SINHA NISHANT [IN], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1b * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0079]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2019340684 (BELANGER JEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0073]; figures 2, 3 * |