EP4058499 - POLYSILOXANE FUNCTIONALIZED POLYURETHANES FOR ENHANCING HYDROPHOBISATION OF SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/38] | POLYSILOXANE-FUNCTIONALIZED POLYURETHANES FOR BOOSTING THE HYDROPHOBICITY OF SURFACES | ||
[2024/27] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states Covestro Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLLING, Florian Uhlandstraße 18 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
HECKING, Andreas Haus-Gravener-Str. 109 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
DER, Nadine Salzburger Str. 2 40789 Monheim / DE | 04 /
MAGER, Dieter Carl-Leverkus-Str. 31a 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude K12 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20800676.7 | 09.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020EP81411 | Priority number, date | EP20190209291 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209291 | [2022/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021094229 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4058499 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/61, C08G18/10, C08G18/24, C08G18/28, C08G18/32, C08G18/42, C08G18/62, C08G18/65, C08G18/72, C08G18/73, C08G18/75, C08G18/78, C08G18/79, C09D5/02, C09D175/04, C09D175/06, C09D183/10, C08G77/26, C08G77/458, C08L83/10 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/61 (EP,US);
C08G18/246 (EP);
C08G18/282 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (EP);
C08G18/3234 (EP);
C08G18/4238 (EP);
C08G18/6229 (EP);
C08G18/6517 (EP);
C08G18/725 (EP);
C08G18/73 (EP,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,US);
C08G18/7837 (EP);
C08G18/792 (EP);
C08L83/10 (EP);
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
C09D175/06 (EP);
C09D5/024 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/4238 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/44 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/6225 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | C08G18/61, C08G18/10, C08G18/24, C08G18/28, C08G18/32, C08G18/42, C08G18/62, C08G18/65, C08G18/72, C08G18/73, C08G18/75, C08G18/78, C08G18/79, C09D5/02, C09D175/04, C09D175/06, C09D183/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | POLYSILOXAN-FUNKTIONALISIERTE POLYURETHANE ZUR STEIGERUNG DER HYDROPHOBIE VON OBERFLÄCHEN | [2022/38] | English: | POLYSILOXANE FUNCTIONALIZED POLYURETHANES FOR ENHANCING HYDROPHOBISATION OF SURFACES | [2024/27] | French: | POLYURÉTHANES FONCTIONNALISÉS PAR POLYSILOXANE PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER L'HYDROPHOBIE DES SURFACES | [2024/27] |
Former [2022/38] | POLYSILOXANE-FUNCTIONALIZED POLYURETHANES FOR BOOSTING THE HYDROPHOBICITY OF SURFACES | ||
Former [2022/38] | POLYURÉTHANES FONCTIONNALISÉS PAR UN POLYSILOXANE POUR RENFORCER L'HYDROPHOBICITÉ DE SURFACES | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 15.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2015307745 (POPA PAUL J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 4] - paragraph [0006]; claims 1-13 * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0029]; examples 1-29 * * paragraph [0025]; table - * [I] 7,9; | [XA]CN105367732 (BEIJING AUTOMOBILE RES GENERAL INST CO LTD) [X] 1-6,11 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 5]; claims 1-9 * * examples 1-5 *[A] 7-10,12,13; | [XAI]CN108586703 (LENGINE DEFENSE TECH GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8,10-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 4]; claims 1-9 * * Formel (I); paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0021] * * examples 1-3 * [A] 7 [I] 9; | [T] - Siltech Corporation, "Silmer NCO Di-50 - Isocyanate Functional Pre-Polymer", Toronto, Ontario, Canada, M4H 1G5, (20081001), URL: https://www.siltech.com/wp-content/uploads/2017/11/TP5761.pdf, (20210118), XP055766306 | by applicant | DE1670666 | DE1770245 | EP0000469 | EP0148329 | DE3700209 | EP0330966 | EP0336205 | EP0339396 | EP0358979 | DE3900053 | EP0496205 | EP0557844 | WO9403511 | EP0583728 | WO9420559 | WO9428043 | WO9502005 | EP0689556 | EP0798299 | EP0937110 | EP0994117 | WO0109260 | EP1273640 | US2008213599 | EP2046861 | US2014275410 | WO2014149331 | WO2017151621 | WO2018146016 | - "Eine Frage der Einstellung", Farbe und Lack 07/2003, Vinzentz-Verlag, page 1,3 | - U. POTH, Automotive Coatings Formulation, Vinventz-Verlag, (20080000), pages 137 - 163,213-215 | - LAAS et al., J. Prakt. Chem., (19940000), vol. 336, pages 185 - 200 | - Angew. Chem., (19600000), vol. 72, page 927 | - Polyurethanes - Coatings, Adhesives and Sealants, Vincentz Network GmbH, (20190000), pages 48 - 51 |