EP4055027 - NEW PROCESS OF EXTRACTING PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Affibody AB Scheeles väg 2 171 65 Solna / SE | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNÅS, Finn Hedebyvägen 5 168 55 Bromma / SE | 02 /
RÖJSÄTER, Belinda Backvägen 1 169 55 Solna / SE | 03 /
MOKS, Tomas Vallarevägen 11 183 51 Täby / SE | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 20800677.5 | 09.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020EP81420 | Priority number, date | EP20190208153 | 08.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19208153 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021089862 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055027 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/14, C12M1/00, C12N1/06 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
C07K1/145 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12M47/06 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12M41/12 (KR);
C12M41/18 (KR);
C12N1/06 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | NEUES VERFAHREN ZUR PROTEINEXTRAKTION | [2022/37] | English: | NEW PROCESS OF EXTRACTING PROTEIN | [2022/37] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION DE PROTÉINE | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 02.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6197553 (LEE ANN L [US], et al) [A] 14,15* figure 1 *; | [A]WO2007009018 (AVIDIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2008088757 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]WO2012114063 (FUJIFILM DIOSYNTH BIOTECHNOLOGIES UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2018223245 (PASSÉ DAMIEN [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 | by applicant | - WAHLBERG E et al., PNAS, (20030000), vol. 100, no. 6, pages 3185 - 3190 | - KRAULIS et al., FEBS Lett, (19960000), vol. 378, page 190 |