02.08.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
29.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.07.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.06.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.06.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
04.06.2024 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
29.03.2024 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
12.02.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.01.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
12.01.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
12.01.2024 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
12.01.2024 |
Change - English title |
published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
12.01.2024 |
Change - French title |
published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
10.11.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
10.11.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.07.2023 |
First examination report |
|
20.07.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2023 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
28.03.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
28.03.2023 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
27.03.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.01.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.01.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
20.01.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
16.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
19.08.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
19.08.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
25.07.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
10.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.05.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
17.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|