EP4042149 - DETECTION OF ANALYTES BY PROTEIN SWITCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. 1420 Harbor Bay Parkway Alameda, California 94502 / US | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUERHOFF, Anthony c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | 02 /
LEARY, Thomas c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | 03 /
MAROHNIC, Christopher c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | 04 /
KREUTZ, Barry c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | 05 /
CORBY, Josie c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | 06 /
FELDMAN, Benjamin c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | 07 /
OUYANG, Tianmei c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | 08 /
WALI, Ahmed c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | 09 /
ALVIZO, Oscar c/o Codexis, Inc. 200 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, California 94063 / US | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Redhouse, Juliet Lauren, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20800760.9 | 01.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020US53819 | Priority number, date | US201962909411P | 02.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962909411 P | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021067608 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042149 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G01N27/3271 (EP);
C12Q1/32 (US);
C12Q1/005 (US);
G01N33/94 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | NACHWEIS VON ANALYTEN DURCH PROTEINSCHALTER | [2022/33] | English: | DETECTION OF ANALYTES BY PROTEIN SWITCHES | [2022/33] | French: | DÉTECTION D'ANALYTES PAR DES COMMUTATEURS PROTÉIQUES | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 29.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013062878 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [X] 13-19,23,24 * page 3, line 29 - line 31 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 19 *; | [X] - ZHONG GUO ET AL, "Engineering PQQ-glucose dehydrogenase into an allosteric electrochemical Ca 2+ sensor", CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, (20160101), vol. 52, no. 3, doi:10.1039/C5CC07824E, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 485 - 488, XP055331846 [X] 1,3,5,9,25,27,28,55,57 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5CC07824E | [X] - ZHONG GUO ET AL, "Generalizable Protein Biosensors Based on Synthetic Switch Modules", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20190510), vol. 141, no. 20, doi:10.1021/jacs.8b12298, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 8128 - 8135, XP055759797 [X] 1,3,5,9,25,27,28,55,57 * abstract * * page 8129, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jacs.8b12298 | [ ] - "Keto reductase (KRED) cofactor, SEQ ID 4.", Geneseq, (20130606), Database accession no. BAN36046, URL: EBI, XP055759831 [ ] * abstract * | [A] - Stijn J A A, "Engineering protein switches for sensing and actuation", (20160101), URL: https://pure.tue.nl/ws/portalfiles/portal/43570804/20161116_Aper.pdf, (20190924), XP055625321 [A] 1-67 * the whole document * | [A] - RUDOLF GRISS ET AL, "Bioluminescent sensor proteins for point-of-care therapeutic drug monitoring", NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (20140608), vol. 10, no. 7, doi:10.1038/nchembio.1554, ISSN 1552-4450, pages 598 - 603, XP055146028 [A] 1-67 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchembio.1554 | [A] - MOLAAKBARI ELAHEH ET AL, "Synthesis of conductive polymeric ionic liquid/Ni nanocomposite and its application to construct a nanostructure based electrochemical sensor for determination of warfarin in the presence of tramadol", TALANTA, (20161004), vol. 171, doi:10.1016/J.TALANTA.2017.04.041, ISSN 0039-9140, pages 25 - 31, XP085037818 [A] 1-67 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.talanta.2017.04.041 | [A] - HAIYUN WU ET AL, "New approach for monitoring fish stress: A novel enzyme-functionalized label-free immunosensor system for detecting cortisol levels in fish", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20170701), vol. 93, doi:10.1016/j.bios.2016.10.001, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 57 - 64, XP055759811 [A] 1-67 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2016.10.001 | [T] - HOPE ADAMSON ET AL, "Engineering Protein Switches for Rapid Diagnostic Tests", ACS SENSORS, (20201014), vol. 5, no. 10, doi:10.1021/acssensors.0c01831, ISSN 2379-3694, pages 3001 - 3012, XP055759717 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acssensors.0c01831 | by applicant | WO9522625 | WO9700078 | WO9735966 | WO9827230 | WO0042651 | US6134461 | WO0175767 | US6537746 | US6605200 | US6605201 | US6736957 | US7501053 | US7754093 | US2011213225 | US8268143 | US8444834 | US8460607 | US9194859 | - LING et al., Anal. Biochem., (19970000), vol. 254, no. 2, pages 3389 - 78 | - DALE et al., Methods Mol Biol., (19960000), vol. 57, pages 369 - 74 | - SMITH, Ann. Rev. Genet., (19850000), vol. 19, pages 423 - 462 | - BOTSTEIN et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 229, pages 1193 - 1201 | - CARTER, "Site-directed mutagenesis", Biochem. J., (19860000), vol. 237, pages 1 - 7 | - KRAMER et al., Cell, (19840000), vol. 38, pages 879 - 887 | - WELLS et al., Gene, (19850000), vol. 34, pages 315 - 323 | - Current Opinion in Chemical Biology, (19990000), vol. 3, pages 284 - 290 | - CHRISTIANS et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19990000), vol. 17, pages 259 - 264 | - CRAMERI et al., Nature, (19940000), vol. 370, pages 389 - 391 | - CRAMERI et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19970000), vol. 15, pages 436 - 438 | - ZHANG et al., Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences U.S.A., vol. 94, pages 45 - 4,4509 | - CRAMERI et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 315 - 319 | - STEMMER, Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, U.S.A., (19940000), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 10751 | - FELIX THEEUWES, "Elementary Osmotic Pump", Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19751200), vol. 64, no. 12, pages 1987 - 1991 |