EP4044946 - CONTROL SYSTEM AND USER INTERFACE FOR AN ABLATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSYTH, Bruce R. 10691 108th Avenue Hanover, Minnesota 55341 / US | 02 /
GORZYCKI, Jonathan Tyler 4442 123rd Cir Blaine, Minnesota 55449 / US | 03 /
CANADY, JR., Larry D. 4546 176th Lane NE Ham Lake, Minnesota 55304 / US | 04 /
CAO, Hong 17733 62nd CT N Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | 05 /
OSTROOT, Timothy A. 17037 County Road 35 West Cokato, Minnesota 55321 / US | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20801094.2 | 14.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020US55577 | Priority number, date | US201962915489P | 15.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962915489 P | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021076624 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044946 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, A61B5/0245, A61B5/352, A61B18/14 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/1233 (EP);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B5/346 (EP);
A61B5/4836 (EP);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00613 (US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/00702 (US);
A61B2018/00726 (EP);
A61B2018/00761 (EP);
A61B2018/00767 (EP);
A61B2018/00839 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00898 (EP);
A61B2018/00958 (US);
A61B2018/00982 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | STEUERSYSTEM UND BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EIN ABLATIONSSYSTEM | [2022/34] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM AND USER INTERFACE FOR AN ABLATION SYSTEM | [2022/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE ET INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ABLATION | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 29.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH11346436 (POWER SYSTEM KK, et al); | [I]US2004015163 (BUYSSE STEVEN P [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2008102154 (ECSHMANN HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]US2011170321 (SCHALL HEIKO [DE], et al); | [Y]US2016058493 (NEAL II ROBERT [US], et al) | by applicant | US5855576 | US6638277 | US2019223943 |