EP4041143 - CONNECTOR FOR TRANSFER OF AN IMPLANT TO A CATHETHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clearstream Technologies Limited IP Law Group Moyne Upper Enniscorthy, County Wexford / IE | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDONAGH, Dónal Enniscorthy, County Wexford / IE | 02 /
GILES, Ciaran Enniscorthy, County Wexford / IE | 03 /
O`SHEA, John Enniscorthy, County Wexford / IE | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20801178.3 | 29.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP80398 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022089745 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041143 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4041143 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/95 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/9522 (EP);
A61F2/82 (US);
A61F2250/0073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDER ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES IMPLANTATS AUF EINEN KATHEDER | [2022/33] | English: | CONNECTOR FOR TRANSFER OF AN IMPLANT TO A CATHETHER | [2022/33] | French: | CONNECTEUR POUR LE TRANSFERT D'UN IMPLANT À UN CATHÉTER | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 26.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
MC | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 13.09.2023 | |
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 13.12.2023 | |
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0903110 (BRAUN MEDICAL INC [US]) [I] 1-7 * paragraphs [0080] - [0083]; figures 24,25 *; | [XI]WO2012036742 (ST JUDE MEDICAL CARDIOLOGY DIV [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,16 * paragraphs [0051] - [0053]; figures 13A-13D,16 * [I] 2,5-7,9-15; | [I]CN110251273 (PEIJIA MEDICAL SUZHOU CO LTD) [I] 1-16* paragraphs [0020] - [0047]; figures 1-8 * |