EP4059322 - CHANGING TRANSMISSION AND/OR RECEPTION CHARACTERISTICS FOR DETECTING EVENTS OTHER THAN HUMAN PRESENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALIAKSEYEU, Dzmitry, Viktorovich c/o High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MEERBEEK, Berent, Willem c/o High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
KRAJNC, Hugo, José c/o High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20801282.3 | 10.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020EP81623 | Priority number, date | EP20190209314 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209314 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021094303 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059322 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4059322 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05B47/19, H05B47/115, H04L12/28, G08B21/20, G01S7/41, G01S13/88, G01S13/87, G01S13/56, G01S13/04 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
H05B47/115 (EP);
G01S13/872 (US);
G01S13/04 (EP);
G01S13/56 (EP,US);
G01S13/878 (EP);
G01S13/886 (EP,US);
G01S7/412 (EP,US);
G01S7/415 (EP);
H04L12/2816 (EP);
H05B47/19 (EP);
H05B47/196 (EP);
G08B21/20 (EP,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÄNDERUNG DER SENDE- UND/ODER EMPFANGSEIGENSCHAFTEN ZUM ERKENNEN ANDERER EREIGNISSE ALS DER ANWESENHEIT VON PERSONEN | [2022/38] | English: | CHANGING TRANSMISSION AND/OR RECEPTION CHARACTERISTICS FOR DETECTING EVENTS OTHER THAN HUMAN PRESENCE | [2022/38] | French: | MODIFICATION DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE TRANSMISSION ET/OU DE RÉCEPTION POUR DÉTECTER DES ÉVÉNEMENTS AUTRES QUE LA PRÉSENCE HUMAINE | [2023/09] |
Former [2022/38] | CHANGEMENT DE CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE TRANSMISSION ET/OU DE RÉCEPTION POUR DÉTECTER DES ÉVÉNEMENTS AUTRES QUE LA PRÉSENCE HUMAINE | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 15.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.2024
29.04.2024
ADMISSIBLE Tridonic GmbH & Co. KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.2024
Tridonic GmbH & Co. KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT Opponent's representative Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | 15.05.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.09.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | BG | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IE | 10.11.2023 | LU | 10.11.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | BE | 30.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/47] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IE | 10.11.2023 | ||
LU | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
BE | 30.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/46] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IE | 10.11.2023 | ||
LU | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
LU | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
LU | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9904283 (KOHLER CO [US], et al); | [A]WO2004003591 (IT HOEJSKOLEN [DK], et al); | [A]US2017086202 (CHEN XUETAO [US]); | [A]DE102016210172 (ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH [AT]); | [A]US2018012641 (WOOTTON JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2019250265 (LU YENPAO [US], et al); | [A]US2019272741 (MACKENZIE KYLE [US], et al) | by applicant | US2019250265 | Opposition | WO9904283 | WO2004003591 | WO2016103394 | US2017086202 | DE102016210172 | US2018012641 | US2019250265 | US2019272741 |