EP4051466 - ROBOTIC JOINT CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CMR Surgical Limited 1 Evolution Business Park Milton Road Cambridge CB24 9NG / GB | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILLIPS, Desmond CMR Surgical Limited 1 Evolution Business Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB24 9NG / GB | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Slingsby Partners LLP 1 Kingsway London WC2B 6AN / GB | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20801357.3 | 27.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020GB52714 | Priority number, date | GB20190015688 | 29.10.2019 Original published format: GB 201915688 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021084238 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051466 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16, A61B34/30, A61B34/00 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
B25J9/1643 (EP,US);
A61B34/30 (EP,GB,US);
A61B34/35 (US);
A61B34/74 (EP);
A61B34/76 (EP);
A61B90/06 (US);
B25J9/1651 (GB);
G16H20/40 (US);
G16H40/63 (US);
A61B2034/2059 (EP);
A61B2034/305 (US);
A61B2090/061 (US);
A61B2090/066 (EP,US);
A61B2090/067 (EP,US);
B25J9/1633 (US);
B25J9/1653 (US);
G05B2219/40333 (EP);
G05B2219/40367 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | ROBOTERVERBINDUNGSSTEUERUNG | [2022/36] | English: | ROBOTIC JOINT CONTROL | [2022/36] | French: | COMMANDE D'ARTICULATION ROBOTIQUE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 23.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2014043702 (RETHINK ROBOTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,11,13-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 1 * [I] 10,12; | [X]US2014358161 (HOURTASH ARJANG M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7-9,13-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0078] *; | [X]WO2015142796 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) [X] 1,3,7-9,13-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0096] *; | [XI] - CHRISTIAN SCHEURER ET AL, "Industrial implementation of a multi-task redundancy resolution at velocity level for highly redundant mobile manipulators", ROBOTICS IN THE ERA OF DIGITALISATION : 47TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ROBOTICS : JUNE 21-22, 2016, MESSE MÜNCHEN, ENTRANCE EAST, MUNICH, GERMANY, DE, (20160621), ISBN 978-3-8007-4231-8, pages 109 - 117, XP055525840 [X] 1,3-5,7-9,13-15 * sections 3-4 * [I] 6 | [T] - Stefano Chiaverini ET AL, "Part A - Chapter 10. Redundant Robots", Springer Handbook of Robotics, Cham, Springer International Publishing, (20160727), pages 221 - 242, ISBN 978-3-319-32552-1, XP055767312 [T] * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2014GB53523 |