EP3963341 - TORSION WING PROBE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRUKER NANO, INC. 112 Robin Hill Road Santa Barbara, CA 93117 / US | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Shuiqing 175 N Kellogg Ave Apt A Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | 02 /
WAGNER, Martin 175 N Kellogg Ave Apt A Santa Barbara, CA 93111 / US | 03 /
WANG, Weijie 2218 Rutland Place Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | 04 /
SU, Chanmin 7023 Etna Court Ventura, CA 93003 / US | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20801882.0 | 04.05.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020US31334 | Priority number, date | US201962842973P | 03.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962842973 P | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020227222 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963341 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01Q60/38, G01Q70/10, G01Q60/32 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
G01Q70/10 (EP);
G01Q60/38 (EP,KR,US);
G01Q20/02 (US);
G01Q10/04 (KR);
G01Q60/32 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | G01Q60/38, G01Q10/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | TORSIONSFLÜGELSONDENANORDNUNG | [2022/10] | English: | TORSION WING PROBE ASSEMBLY | [2022/10] | French: | ENSEMBLE SONDE À AILE DE TORSION | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 20.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JPH01262403 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,5,6,8 * figures 3,4 * [A] 10-18[I] 2-4,7,9; | [XI]EP2163907 (KARLSRUHER INST TECHNOLOGIE [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10-13,15,18 * figure 1a * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * [I] 2-4,8,9,14,16,17; | [XAI] - LEE D W ET AL, "Cantilever with integrated resonator for application of scanning probe microscope", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A: PHYSICAL, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20000501), vol. 83, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/S0924-4247(99)00378-7, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 11 - 16, XP004198286 [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10 * figures 1,6 * * table 1 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [03.2] * [A] 5,6,11-18 [I] 3,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-4247(99)00378-7 | International search | [X]US6100524 (YAGI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8, 10-18 * column 4, line 32 - column 8, line 44, claims 1, 5-9, and figures 3A-10 *; | [A]US2008128385 (BEYDER ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 1-8, 10-18 * paragraphs [0043]-[0056] and figures 2-4 *; | [X]US2008257022 (SACHS FREDERICK [US]) [X] 1, 11, 15 * paragraphs [0029]-[0049] and figures 1, 3 *; | [X]EP1985991 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [X] 1, 11, 15 * paragraphs [0019]-[0051] and figures 1-3 *; | [A]KR20090130537 (DOOSAN MECATEC CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8, 10-18* claim 1 and figures 3, 4 (? Note: Claim 9 is missing in this application.) * | by applicant | JPH01262403 | US5266801 | USRE34489E | US5412980 | US6100524 | US2008257022 | EP1985991 | KR20090130537 | EP2163907 | US8646109 | US8650660 | US8739309 | US2018052186 | - "Cantilever with integrated resonator for application of scanning probe microscope", LEE D W et al., SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A: PHYSICAL, ELSEVIER BV, (20000501), vol. 83, pages 11 - 16 |