EP3965876 - TECHNIQUES FOR STIMULATION ARTEFACT ELIMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cochlear Limited 1 University Avenue Macquarie University, New South Wales 2109 / AU | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELMAN, Ryan Orin c/o Cochlear Limited, 1 University Avenue Macquarie University, New South Wales 2109 / AU | 02 /
LUPTON, Todd c/o Cochlear Limited, 1 University Avenue Macquarie University, New South Wales 2109 / AU | 03 /
CARTER, Paul Michael c/o Cochlear Limited, 1 University Avenue Macquarie University, New South Wales 2109 / AU | 04 /
KUMAR, Shaun c/o Cochlear Limited, 1 University Avenue Macquarie University, New South Wales 2109 / AU | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20802101.4 | 05.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020IB54266 | Priority number, date | US201962844079P | 06.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962844079 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020225732 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965876 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, A61N1/372, A61N1/05, H04R25/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
H04R25/606 (EP);
A61N1/36039 (EP,US);
A61B5/388 (US);
H04R25/70 (EP);
A61N1/0541 (EP);
H04R2460/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUR STIMULATIONSARTEFAKTELIMINIERUNG | [2022/11] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR STIMULATION ARTEFACT ELIMINATION | [2022/11] | French: | TECHNIQUES D'ÉLIMINATION D'ARTEFACTS DE STIMULATION | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 17.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2238899 (GN RESOUND AS [DK]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] - [0071] *; | [A]US2012116741 (CHOI CHARLES TAK MING [TW], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2014134258 (MED EL ELEKTROMED GERAETE GMBH [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018173010 (COCHLEAR LTD [AU]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2010257128 (DE VRIES AALBERT [NL], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [X]US2012116741 (CHOI CHARLES TAK MING [TW], et al) [X] 1-35 * claims 1-12; paragraphs [0013]-[0026] *; | [A]US2014294188 (RINI STEFANO [IT], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015306388 (NOGUEIRA WALDO [DE], et al) [A] 1-35* the whole document *; | [A]US9415220 (SPINELLI JULIO CÉSAR [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2238899 |