EP3966187 - PROMOTERS FOR HETEROGENEOUS OLEFIN METATHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company TN-814 Tower Administration Building Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMAN, Yuriy 235 Albany St., Apt 2047 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Shiran 44 Cherry St 11 Somerville, MA 02144 / US | 03 /
CONSOLI, Daniel 20 Cornelius Way Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | 04 /
SHAIKH, Sohel Research and Development Center Dhahran / SA | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20802535.3 | 08.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020US32060 | Priority number, date | US201962845849P | 09.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962845849 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020227616 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966187 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/28, C07C6/04, C07C11/04, C07C11/06 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
B01J23/30 (EP,US);
C07C6/04 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (US);
B01J23/28 (EP,US);
B01J23/36 (US);
B01J35/30 (EP);
B01J37/08 (EP);
B01J37/343 (EP);
C07C2521/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C6/04, C07C11/04 (EP);
C07C6/04, C07C11/06 (EP);
C07C6/04, C07C11/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | C07C6/04, C07C11/04, C07C11/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | PROMOTER FÜR HETEROGENE OLEFINMETATHESE | [2022/11] | English: | PROMOTERS FOR HETEROGENEOUS OLEFIN METATHESIS | [2022/11] | French: | PROMOTEURS POUR LA MÉTATHÈSE D'OLÉFINE HÉTÉROGÈNE | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03076371 (ABB LUMMUS GLOBAL INC [US]) [X] 1-7,9-14 * page 13, line 14 - page 14, line 1 * [I] 8; | [A]US2016075617 (DING KUNLUN [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | International search | [X]US5254786 (LIN JIANG-JEN [US], et al) [X] 17 * entire document *; | [Y]US6184170 (CHANG MAIN [US]) [Y] 1-6 * entire document *; | [X]US6437209 (COMMEREUC DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [X] 16, 18 * entire document *; | [Y]US6777582 (GARTSIDE ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 5, 6* entire document *; | [Y]US9023753 (RAMACHANDRAN BALA [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * entire document * |