Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4055902
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.07.2024 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
05.04.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.10.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2023 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
13.01.2023 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
16.12.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
12.08.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
12.08.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
18.07.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
05.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
16.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|