EP4241523 - DELAY INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | 12.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSA, Claudio 8920 Randers NV / DK | 02 /
TOFT, Morten 9230 Svenstrup / DK | 03 /
ABREU, Renato Barbosa 9000 Aalborg / DK | 04 /
LASELVA, Daniela 9270 Klarup / DK | 05 /
KARIMIDEHKORDI, Ali 81669 Munich / DE | 06 /
MALDONADO, Roberto 9000 Aalborg / DK | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/37] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 20803525.3 | 06.11.2020 | [2023/37] | WO2020EP81223 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022096118 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4241523 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
H04W72/23 (EP);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04W72/21 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | VERZÖGERUNGSINFORMATION | [2023/37] | English: | DELAY INFORMATION | [2023/37] | French: | INFORMATIONS DE RETARD | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 06.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2019274137 (BHATTAD KAPIL [IN], et al) [Y] 9,10,28,29 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0080] *; | [XYI]WO2020069114 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]) [X] 1-8,12-14,17-27,31-34,37,38 * paragraphs [0205] - [0217] * [Y] 9,10,28,29 [I] 11,15,16,30,35,36; | [A]WO2020153610 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-38* paragraphs [0229] - [0230] *; | [A]WO2020186393 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-38 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] * |