EP4057850 - SMOKING SUBSTITUTE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 02.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial Tobacco Limited 121 Winterstoke Road Bristol, BS3 2LL / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGGARWAL, Nikhil c/o Nerudia Limited Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20803615.2 | 13.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020EP82118 | Priority number, date | EP20190209421 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209421 | EP20190209424 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209424 | EP20190209428 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209428 | EP20190209431 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209431 | EP20190209436 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209436 | EP20190209450 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209450 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021094573 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4057850 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/44, A24F40/46 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
A24F40/44 (EP,US);
A24F40/46 (EP,US);
A24F40/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | RAUCHERSATZVORRICHTUNG | [2022/38] | English: | SMOKING SUBSTITUTE DEVICE | [2022/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUBSTITUTION POUR FUMEUR | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 06.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2016176800 (FONTEM HOLDINGS 2 BV [NL], et al); | [A]WO2018211252 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]); | [A]EP3476229 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]); | [XAI]US2019246693 (NETTENSTROM MATTHEW JOEL [GB], et al); | [XA]CN110432557 (SUZHOU JINGPIN ADVANCED MAT CO LTD); | [XP]WO2019237052 (JUUL LABS INC [US]) |