EP4045577 - SHRINK FILMS INCORPORATING POST-CONSUMER RESIN AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braskem S.A. Rua Eterno 156 Complexo Petroquímico de Camaçari 42810-000 Camaçari / BR | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Gabriel Degues Rua Lemos Monteiro, 120, 23rd floor 05501-050 São Paulo / BR | 02 /
TOMASI, Leandro de Castro Rua Lemos Monteiro, 120, 23rd floor 05501-050 São Paulo / BR | 03 /
SILVA, Carlos André Rua Lemos Monteiro, 120, 23rd floor 05501-050 São Paulo / BR | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | Osha Liang 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20803639.2 | 15.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020IB20062 | Priority number, date | US201962915376P | 15.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962915376 P | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021074697 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045577 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B32B27/32 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP);
B32B27/08 (US);
B29D7/01 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B7/022 (US);
B32B7/08 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/242 (US);
B32B2250/246 (EP);
B32B2250/44 (US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2272/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/30 (US);
B32B2307/406 (US);
B32B2307/50 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US);
B32B2307/5825 (US);
B32B2307/72 (US);
B32B2307/736 (US);
C08J2300/30 (EP);
C08J2323/06 (EP);
C08J2323/08 (EP);
C08J2400/30 (EP);
C08J2423/06 (EP);
C08J2423/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | SCHRUMPFFOLIEN MIT RECYCELTEM HARZ UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/34] | English: | SHRINK FILMS INCORPORATING POST-CONSUMER RESIN AND METHODS THEREOF | [2022/34] | French: | FILMS RÉTRACTABLES INTÉGRANT UNE RÉSINE POST-CONSOMMATION ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 13.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2218997 (TENO AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,11-26,31,49 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * examples 1-4, 6, 7, 9, 10 * * claims 1-3, 5, 8 *; | [X]US5128212 (KNEALE TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,11,31,46,48,49 * column 1, lines 11-14 * * examples 1-3; table II * * claims 1, 6, 9-12, 17, 22 *; | [X]US2010227136 (RAMLI RAFIZI [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,11,13,31,37,49 * paragraphs [0113] - [0121] * * examples 5, 17-20, 35, 39, 42, 46, 47, 51, 53, 55, 60, 63 * * examples 66, 69 * * claims 1, 4, 5, 25-27 *; | [X]EP3483206 (TRIOPLAST FRANCE SAS [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,27,31,33,38,45,49 * paragraphs [0012] , [ 0014] , [ 0034] - [0036] - [ 0043] - [0048] - [ 0053] - [0055] * * example 6; tables 4b, 7, 9 *; | [E]WO2020223019 (EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [E] 1-7,11-49 * examples 1-5 * * claims 1-17 *; | [E]WO2020229932 (NOVA CHEM INT SA [CH]) [E] 1,3,4,6,7,11-29,31-49 * example 3 * * claims 1-4, 8-12, 14, 15, 17-20, 24, 25 *; | [A] - AL-SALEM S M ET AL, "Study of the degradation profile for virgin linear low-density polyethylene (LLDPE) and polyolefin (PO) plastic waste blends", JOURNAL OF MATERIAL CYCLES AND WASTE MANAGEMENT, SPRINGER JAPAN, TOKYO, vol. 21, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S10163-019-00868-8, ISSN 1438-4957, (20190504), pages 1106 - 1122, (20190504), XP036871570 [A] 1-49 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10163-019-00868-8 | by applicant | US4396789 | US9181143 |