EP4018018 - MATRIX-CONTROLLED PRINTHEAD FOR AN ELECTROCHEMICAL ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fabric8Labs, Inc. 6351 Nancy Ridge Drive Unit B San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAIN, David 6351 Nancy Ridge Drive Unit B San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
EDMONDS, Andrew 6351 Nancy Ridge Drive Unit B San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
HERMAN, Jeffrey 6351 Nancy Ridge Drive Unit B San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
PATEROS, Charles 6351 Nancy Ridge Drive Unit B San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 05 /
WIRTH, David 6351 Nancy Ridge Drive Unit B San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 20803671.5 | 21.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020US47531 | Priority number, date | US201962890815P | 23.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962890815 P | US202016795495 | 19.02.2020 Original published format: US202016795495 | US202062983274P | 28.02.2020 Original published format: US 202062983274 P | US202016926598 | 10.07.2020 Original published format: US202016926598 | US202016941372 | 28.07.2020 Original published format: US202016941372 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021041265 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018018 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2023 | Supplementary international search report - requested on: | EP | 30.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25D1/00, B33Y30/00, // C25D1/20 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C25D1/003 (EP);
B33Y30/00 (EP);
C25D1/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | C25D1/00, B33Y30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | MATRIXGESTEUERTER DRUCKKOPF FÜR EIN ELEKTROCHEMISCHES GENERATIVES FERTIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/26] | English: | MATRIX-CONTROLLED PRINTHEAD FOR AN ELECTROCHEMICAL ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING SYSTEM | [2022/26] | French: | TÊTE D'IMPRESSION À COMMANDE MATRICIELLE POUR SYSTÈME DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2022 | Observations by third parties | 16.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 16.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2023/45] | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007089993 (SCHWARTZ DANIEL T [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 5 * * claim 1 *; | [X]CN204097583U (WENZHOU INST OF INDUSTRY & SCIENCE) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1, 4 ** claim 1 *; | [X]WO2017087884 (FABRIC8LABS INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1, 3 * * claims 1-11, 17 * * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0039] - [0040] - [ 0052] *; | [X]US2019160594 (FLAMM JASON K [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claim 1 * * paragraph [0003] *; | [X]WO2019150362 (ADDIONICS IL LTD [IL]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2004129573 (COHEN ADAM L [US]) [A] 1-30* , See entire documents. *; | [A]US2007221504 (LUO YUEFENG [US]) [A] 1-30 * , See entire documents. * | by applicant | US10465307 |