EP3970298 - METHODS, TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK NODE FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Min Granitstigen 27 977 53 Lulea / SE | 02 /
LIU, Jinhua No. 5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20805164.9 | 27.03.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020CN81746 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN86720 | 13.05.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/086720 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020228428 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970298 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H04L1/188 (EP);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKKNOTEN FÜR UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2022/12] | English: | METHODS, TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK NODE FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION | [2022/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, ÉQUIPEMENT TERMINAL ET NOEUD DE RÉSEAU POUR TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 30.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 01.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2019030726 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0071] - [0221]; figure 5 *; | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Transmission with configured grant in NR unlicensed band", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190503), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1906047, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F97/Docs/R1%2D1906047%2Ezip, (20190503), XP051708089 [X] 1-15 * paragraphs=sections; paragraphs [02.1] , [ 2.3] , [ 2.4.1] * * paragraphs [02.1] , [ 2.3] , [ 3.1] , [00 5] * * "timedomainoffset"; page 3 * * paragraph [3.1.2] * * paragraphs [02.3] , [ 2.4.1] * * paragraph [0003] * | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Transmission with configured grant in NR unlicensed band", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180511), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1805922, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F93/Docs, (20180511), XP051461632 [X] 1-15 * paragraphs=sections; paragraph [2.1.1] * * page 4; figure 2 * * paragraph [2.2.2] * * "UE directed"; paragraph [02.4] * | International search | [Y]CN101207465 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 30-39,42-45 * claim 1, description, page 8 *; | [X]WO2019030726 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-29,40,41,46 * description, paragraphs 71-221 and figure 5 *; | [Y]WO2019030726 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 30-39,42-45 * description, paragraphs 71-221 and figure 5 *; | [X] - Ericsson, "On Autonomous UL Transmissions for NR-U", TDoc R2-1817972,3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #104,Spokane, WA, USA, 12th - 16th November 2018, (20181102), doi:20200611095446X, XP051557480 [X] 1-29,40,41,46 * sections 1-4 * | [Y] - Ericsson, "On Autonomous UL Transmissions for NR-U", TDoc R2-1817972,3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #104,Spokane, WA, USA, 12th - 16th November 2018, (20181102), doi:20200611095355X, XP051557480 [Y] 30-39,42-45 * sections 1-4 * | by applicant | - HUAWEI et al., "Transmission with configured grant in NR unlicensed band", 3GPP draft, R1-1906047 | - HUAWEI et al., "Transmission with configured grant in NR unlicensed band", 3GPP draft, R1-1805922 |