22.03.2024 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
01.03.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
27.02.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
27.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.02.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.12.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.12.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] |
08.12.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] |
25.08.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
18.11.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
21.10.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.06.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
17.06.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
17.06.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
24.05.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
05.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
08.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|