EP4136639 - NON-VOLATILE MEMORY SYSTEM USING STRAP CELLS IN SOURCE LINE PULL DOWN CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silicon Storage Technology Inc. 450 Holger Way San Jose CA 95134 / US | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XING, Leo No. 18 Lane 2277 Zuchongzhi Road Shanghai 201210 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Chunming Room 402, No. 16, Lane 238 Huoxiang Road Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Xian 1236 Sargent Dr. Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 04 /
DO, Nhan 20451 Walnut Avenue Saratoga, California 95070 / US | 05 /
LIN, Guangming Rm. 503, No. 51, Lane 825, Chenhui Shanghai 201203 / CN | 06 /
ZHU, Yaohua Lane 1617, Jingao Road, 307 Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 20807194.4 | 20.10.2020 | [2023/08] | WO2020US56430 | Priority number, date | CN202010304167 | 17.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010304167 | US202017074103 | 19.10.2020 Original published format: US202017074103 | [2023/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021211164 | Date: | 21.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4136639 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4136639 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/30, G11C16/04, G11C16/08, G11C16/14, G11C16/26, H10B41/40, // G11C16/10, G11C16/12 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
G11C16/0425 (EP,KR);
G11C16/14 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G11C16/08 (EP,CN,KR);
G11C16/12 (EP,KR,US);
G11C16/0433 (EP,KR);
G11C16/24 (CN);
G11C16/26 (EP,KR,US);
H10B41/40 (EP,KR);
G11C16/10 (EP);
G11C2216/04 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/08] | G11C16/30, G11C16/04, G11C16/08, G11C16/24, G11C16/12, G11C16/14, G11C16/26, H01L27/11587 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTFLÜCHTIGES SPEICHERSYSTEM MIT BAND-ZELLEN IN SOURCE-LINE-PULL-DOWN-SCHALTUNGEN | [2023/08] | English: | NON-VOLATILE MEMORY SYSTEM USING STRAP CELLS IN SOURCE LINE PULL DOWN CIRCUITS | [2023/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MÉMOIRE NON VOLATILE UTILISANT DES CELLULES DE SANGLE DANS DES CIRCUITS D'EXCURSION BASSE DE LIGNE SOURCE | [2023/08] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/08] | 27.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010008141 (CHU YI-SHIN [TW], et al); | [XA]US2010226181 (TRAN HIEU VAN [US], et al); | [XI]EP3347899 (SILICON STORAGE TECH INC [US]); | [XI]US2018204627 (TRAN HIEU VAN [US], et al); | [A]US2020105775 (HUANG WEN-TUO [TW], et al) | by applicant | WO2017044251 |