EP4055904 - CONFIGURABLE STARTING POSITION OF SEARCH SPACE WINDOW FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION ON PRE-CONFIGURED RESOURCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖGLUND, Andreas Igelbacken 39 170 62 Solna / SE | 02 /
YAVUZ, Emre Kristinebergs Strand 35 112 52 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
TIRRONEN, Tuomas Savitaipaleentie 9 B 00950 Helsinki / FI | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20807513.5 | 06.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020IB60477 | Priority number, date | US201962932497P | 07.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962932497 P | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021090266 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055904 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W72/04 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W52/0225 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | KONFIGURIERBARE STARTPOSITION EINES SUCHRAUMFENSTERS FÜR UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNG AUF VORKONFIGURIERTEN RESSOURCEN | [2022/37] | English: | CONFIGURABLE STARTING POSITION OF SEARCH SPACE WINDOW FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSION ON PRE-CONFIGURED RESOURCES | [2022/37] | French: | POSITION DE DÉPART CONFIGURABLE D'UNE FENÊTRE D'ESPACE DE RECHERCHE POUR UNE TRANSMISSION DE LIAISON MONTANTE SUR DES RESSOURCES PRÉCONFIGURÉES | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 06.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2019313383 (XIONG GANG [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0081]; figure 3 *; | [XI] - ERICSSON, "General PUR Procedure", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190815), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1910436 - GENERAL PUR PROCEDURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_107/Docs/R2-1910436.zip, (20190815), XP051768215 [X] 1,6,7,10,11,14-16,21,22,25,26,29-32 * Configuration information for PUR; paragraph [2.2.1] * * PUR SS window; paragraph [2.3.4] * [I] 1-32 | [A] - ZTE CORPORATION ET AL, "Further consideration on UL aspects of D-PUR in IDLE", vol. RAN WG2, no. Xi'an, China; 20190408 - 20190412, (20190406), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1903485 FURTHER CONSIDERATION ON UL ASPECTS OF D-PUR IN IDLE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN2/Docs/R2%2D1903485%2Ezip, (20190406), XP051700829 [A] 1-32 * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.3] * |