EP4070904 - WELDING TRANSFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koyo Giken Inc. 2-7-6 Hashimotodai Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 2520132 / JP | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAI, Kouji 2-7-6 Hashimotodai Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 2520132 / JP | 02 /
HOUZAN, Kazuki 2-7-6 Hashimotodai Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 2520132 / JP | 03 /
SHINOZAKI, Tuyosi 2-7-6 Hashimotodai Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 2520132 / JP | 04 /
KAI, Mitoshi 2-7-6 Hashimotodai Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 2520132 / JP | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20807647.1 | 24.03.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020JP13131 | Priority number, date | JP20190218705 | 03.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019218705 | [2022/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021111651 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070904 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/24, H01F30/10, H01F27/28, H01F38/08, // H01F27/40, H01F27/10 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H01F30/10 (EP);
H01F38/085 (EP,KR,US);
H01F27/10 (EP,KR,US);
B23K11/24 (EP);
B23K11/241 (KR,US);
F28F3/048 (US);
H01F27/2852 (EP);
H01F27/2876 (EP);
H01F3/08 (EP);
H01F2027/408 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/41] | B23K11/24, H01F30/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | SCHWEISSTRANSFORMATOR | [2022/41] | English: | WELDING TRANSFORMER | [2022/41] | French: | TRANSFORMATEUR DE SOUDAGE | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2020 | Translation filed | 25.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 26.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0582357 (NIKKI DENSO KK) [X] 1 * §§1-25;; figures 1-7 * [A] 2-8; | [XA]DE202009012960U (NIMAK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * §§5-22;; figures 5-1-5-5 * [A] 3-8; | [XA]US2010156585 (SOLAR ANTON [SI], et al) [X] 1,2 * §§35-49;; figures 1-4 * [A] 3-8; | [A]JP2014232822 (KOYO GIKEN KK) [A] 1-8* figures 2, 4, 5 *; | [A]US9202622 (KAI KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 13-15 * | International search | [A]JPH06151211 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * 0019-0040,1-7 *; | [A]JP2008130657 (OBARA CORP) [A] 1-6 * 0011-0019, 1-4 *; | [A]JP2013172066 (KOYO GIKEN KK) [A] 1-6 * 0 0 1 4 - 0 0 6 2, 1 -1 2 *; | [A]JP2015501539 [A] 1-6* 00 9 3, 7 * | by applicant | WO2012JP66646 |