EP4061453 - DRY POWDER INHALER WITH AN ADHERENCE/COMPLIANCE MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2025 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vectura Delivery Devices Limited One Prospect West Chippenham, Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB | ||
[2022/39] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELINIOTIS, Andreas c/o VDDL 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | ||
02 /
CLARKE, Roger c/o VDDL 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | |||
03 /
COTTON, Darryl c/o VDDL 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB40GZ / GB | |||
04 /
DEAMER, John c/o VDDL 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | |||
05 /
SMITH, Philip c/o VDDL 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | |||
06 /
SWANBURY, Philip c/o VDDL 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | |||
07 /
THOMAS, Seth c/o VDDL 205 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GZ / GB | |||
[2023/34] | |||
Representative(s) | Clarke, Christopher John Vectura Limited Intellectual Property Department One Prospect West Chippenham Wiltshire SN14 6FH / GB | ||
[2022/39] | |||
Application number, filing date | 20807741.2 | 17.11.2020 | |
[2022/39] | |||
WO2020EP82428 | |||
Priority number, date | EP20190209857 | 18.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209857 | |
EP20190209856 | 18.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209856 | ||
EP20190209858 | 18.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19209858 | ||
[2022/39] | |||
Filing language | EN | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | WO2021099328 | ||
Date: | 27.05.2021 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2021/21] | |||
Type: | A1 Application with search report | ||
No.: | EP4061453 | ||
Date: | 28.09.2022 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | |||
[2022/39] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP4061453 | ||
Date: | 23.08.2023 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2023/34] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2021 |
Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2022/39] |
CPC: |
A61M15/008 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61M11/003 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61M15/0065 (US);
| ||
C-Set: |
A61M2202/064, A61M2202/0007 (EP)
| ||
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | ||
Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | |
ME | Not yet paid | ||
Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | |
MA | Not yet paid | ||
MD | Not yet paid | ||
TN | Not yet paid | ||
Title | German: | TROCKENPULVERINHALATOR MIT ADHÄRENZ-/COMPLIANCE-MONITOR | [2022/39] |
English: | DRY POWDER INHALER WITH AN ADHERENCE/COMPLIANCE MONITOR | [2022/39] | |
French: | INHALATEUR DE POUDRE SÈCHE DOTÉ D'UN MONITEUR D'ADHÉRENCE/DE CONFORMITÉ | [2023/14] | |
Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | |
13.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
13.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | |
13.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | ||
13.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | ||
22.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | ||
15.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
06.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | ||
31.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
12.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | ||
12.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
13.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.05.2024
23.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE PGA S.P.A. Via Mascheroni 31 20145 Milano / IT | |
[2024/26] | |||
07.06.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | ||
30.08.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | ||
16.09.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | ||
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 23.08.2023 | |
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
MC | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
LU | 17.11.2023 | ||
[2024/51] | |||
Cited in | International search | [A]US2007240712 (FLEMING SCOTT [US], et al); | |
[A]US2016256639 (VAN SICKLE JOHN DAVID [US], et al); | |||
[IA]US2017325734 (SUTHERLAND GARTH CAMPBELL [NZ], et al); | |||
[A]US2019224426 (FARINA SUSAN HANMER [US], et al); | |||
[A]EP3552647 (JABIL CIRCUIT SHANGHAI LTD [CN]) | |||
by applicant | WO2013175177 | ||
WO2013175176 |