EP3975151 - OBJECT RECOGNITION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Astemo, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDO Takeshi c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
NAGASAKI Takeshi c/o Hitachi Astemo, Ltd., 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20808827.8 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020JP19399 | Priority number, date | JP20190097048 | 23.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019097048 | [2022/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020235462 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3975151 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/04, G08G1/09, G06T7/00 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
G06V10/14 (EP);
G06N20/00 (CN);
G06V10/25 (EP);
G06V10/56 (EP);
G06V20/582 (EP);
G08G1/09623 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | OBJEKTERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/13] | English: | OBJECT RECOGNITION DEVICE | [2022/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE D'OBJET | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2021 | Translation filed | 23.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 05.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018137375 (TAKEMURA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0104]; figures 1-15 *; | [A]EP3483832 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0105]; figures 1-18 * | International search | [A]JP2005092861 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1-9 * [0010] - [0073] , [1] - [22] *; | [A]JP2005092857 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-9 * [0009] - [0069] , [1] - [22] *; | [A]JP2014203114 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-9 * [0011] - [0044] , [1] - [3] *; | [Y]JP2015192430 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 6-9 * [0012] - [0173] , [1] - [29] *; | [XY]JP2017027220 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [X] 1-5 * [0010] - [0090], [1]-[15] * [Y] 6-9; | [A]JP2018125585 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-9 * [0017] - [0040], [1] - [5] *; | [PA]JP2019146012 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [PA] 1-9* [0012] - [0078], [1] - [12C] *; | [PA]JP2020038629 (BAIDU ONLINE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY BEIJING CO LTD) [PA] 1-9 * [0013] - [0078], [1] - [4] * |