EP3974485 - PH-SENSITIVE VARIABLE-COLOR INK COMPOSITION, AND PH-SENSITIVE INDICATOR LABEL AND PACKAGING MATERIAL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ Cheiljedang Corporation Ssangnim-dong 330 Dongho-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Do Wan Ssangnim-dong) 330, Dongho-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Jason Ssangnim-dong) 330, Dongho-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Grace Ssangnim-dong) 330, Dongho-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | 04 /
HONG, Seok Jun Ssangnim-dong) 330, Dongho-ro Jung-gu Seoul 04560 / KR | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20809093.6 | 22.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020KR06707 | Priority number, date | KR20190060222 | 22.05.2019 Original published format: KR 20190060222 | [2022/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020235963 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974485 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/50, C09D11/037, C09D11/102, C09D11/033, B32B27/08, B32B27/16, B32B7/12, B65D65/38, B32B7/022, B32B27/32, B32B27/36, B32B27/34, C09D11/10, B65D79/02 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
C09D11/102 (EP,CN,KR);
C09D11/50 (EP,CN,KR);
B32B27/08 (EP,CN,KR);
B32B27/16 (CN,KR);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/34 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B7/022 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP,CN,KR);
B65D65/38 (CN,KR);
C09D11/033 (EP,CN,KR);
C09D11/037 (EP,CN,KR);
C09D11/10 (EP);
G09F3/0291 (CN);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2255/28 (EP);
B32B2307/4023 (EP);
B32B2307/4026 (EP);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/724 (EP);
B32B2307/7242 (EP);
B32B2439/70 (KR);
B32B2519/00 (EP,KR);
B32B2553/00 (EP);
B65D2203/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | C09D11/50, C09D11/037, C09D11/102, C09D11/033, B32B27/08, B32B27/16, B32B7/12, B65D65/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | PH-EMPFINDLICHE FARBTINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VARIABLER FARBE SOWIE PH-EMPFINDLICHES INDIKATORETIKETT UND VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL DAMIT | [2022/13] | English: | PH-SENSITIVE VARIABLE-COLOR INK COMPOSITION, AND PH-SENSITIVE INDICATOR LABEL AND PACKAGING MATERIAL USING SAME | [2022/13] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENCRE À COULEUR VARIABLE SENSIBLE AU PH, ET ÉTIQUETTE INDICATRICE SENSIBLE AU PH ET MATÉRIAU D'EMBALLAGE L'UTILISANT | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | Translation filed | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 21.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0110471 (PATEL GORDHANBHAI N [US]) [X] 1-7,10 * claims 1-7, 30-33, 37 * * examples 1, 7 * * page 13, lines 20-25 * * page 9 - page 10 * * page 4, lines 12-15 * * page 14, lines 1-14 * * table 1 * * figure 3 *; | [XYI]EP1266944 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * claims; examples; paragraphs [0036] - [0039] * [Y] 3 [I] 9,12-15; | [XYI]JP2003072857 (OTSUKA PHARMA FACTORY INC, et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,13-15 * claims; examples; figures; paragraph [0166] * [Y] 3 [I] 10-12; | [Y]US2012143159 (WEI NING [US], et al) [Y] 3* claims; examples * | International search | [Y]KR20010110636 (PARK SANG KYU [KR]) [Y] 1-15* See the entire document. *; | [Y]JP2002129139 (SAKURA COLOR PROD CORP) [Y] 11-12 * See claims 1, 3 and 4; and paragraph [0012]. *; | [Y]KR20170068142 (KOREA FOOD RES INST [KR], et al) [Y] 13-14 * See claims 1 and 5. *; | [Y]KR101820857B (KOREA INST IND TECH [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See claims 1, 5, 8 and 17; and paragraphs [0010] and [0050]-[0052]. *; | [Y]KR20180037736 (UNIV INDUSTRY FOUNDATION YONSEI UNIV WONJU CAMPUS [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * See claims 1, 2, 4, 8 and 9; and paragraphs [0013] and [0014]. * |