Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.11.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
17.06.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
17.06.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
08.06.2022 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.05.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
06.05.2022 | Change - classification | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
06.05.2022 | Change - classification | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
14.01.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
14.01.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
11.01.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.10.2021 | Change - representative | |
28.10.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.11.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.11.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |