EP3952746 - METHOD FOR ASSESSMENT OF AUDIENCE ATTENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPPM Venture, LLC 430 Clinton Ave. 6C Brooklyn New York, NY 11238 / US | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARRA, Lucas, C. 430 Clinton Ave., Apt. 6C Brooklyn, NY 11238 / US | 02 /
MADSEN, Jens 230 West 41 Street, 7th Fl. New York, NY 10036 / US | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/07] | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 20809217.1 | 10.04.2020 | [2022/07] | WO2020US27605 | Priority number, date | US201962831902P | 10.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962831902 P | US201962879765P | 29.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962879765 P | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020236331 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3952746 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/16, H04H60/33 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A61B5/163 (EP);
A61B5/0022 (EP);
A61B5/02438 (EP);
A61B5/1128 (EP);
A61B5/165 (EP);
A61B5/681 (EP);
A61B5/7246 (EP);
G16H10/20 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B2503/24 (EP);
A61B5/0533 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG DER PUBLIKUMSAUFMERKSAMKEIT | [2022/07] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSESSMENT OF AUDIENCE ATTENTION | [2022/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE L'ATTENTION D'UN PUBLIC | [2022/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 28.10.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011133548 (INNERSCOPE RES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5-10,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 14 * * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 27 * * page 9, line 19 - page 13, line 13 * * page 23, line 8 - page 30, line 14 * * figure - * [I] 2-4,11-14; | [XI]WO2015034673 (QUESTIONMARK COMPUTING LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,7,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0081] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 2-4,6,8-14; | [XI]WO2016040673 (UNIV OREGON HEALTH & SCIENCE [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9,13-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0073]; figure - *[I] 5,6,10-12 | International search | [X]WO2010105034 (CORVENTIS INC [US], et al) [X] 20 * ; paragraphs [0072], [0189]-[0190], [0236] *; | [X]WO2011031932 (HOME BOX OFFICE INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * ; entire document *; | [XY]US2014214335 (SIEFERT CALEB J [US]) [X] 1-11,13-19 * ; paragraphs [0055], [0081], [0120], [0139]-[0140] * [Y] 12; | [A]US2016366203 (BLONG DEVIN [US], et al)[A] 1-20; | [Y]WO2017152215 (DARLING MATTHEW ROSS [AU]) [Y] 12 * ; abstract; paragraph [0106] * |