EP3944381 - CONDUCTIVE MATERIAL DISPERSION, AND ELECTRODE AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY MANUFACTURED USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/04] | CONDUCTIVE MATERIAL DISPERSION, AND ELECTRODE AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY PRODUCED USING SAME | ||
[2022/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/04] | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dong Hyun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
YOO, Houng Sik LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KANG, Seong Kyun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
KWON, Gye Min LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
CHOI, Hyeon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/10] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
KIM, Dong Hyun Daejeon 34122 / KR | ||
02 /
YOO, Houng Sik Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
03 /
KANG, Seong Kyun Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
04 /
KWON, Gye Min Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
05 /
CHOI, Hyeon Daejeon 34122 / KR | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20809916.8 | 12.05.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020KR06238 | Priority number, date | KR20190057722 | 17.05.2019 Original published format: KR 20190057722 | [2022/04] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020235849 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944381 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3944381 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, H01M4/13, H01M10/052, C01B32/174, H01M4/04, H01M10/0525 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
C01B32/174 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09C1/56 (US);
H01B1/24 (US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/0404 (EP);
H01M4/13 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M4/622 (EP);
H01M4/624 (CN);
C01B2202/22 (US);
C01B2202/32 (US);
C01P2006/12 (US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
H01M2004/028 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | H01M4/62, H01M4/13, H01M10/052, C01B32/174 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DISPERSION LEITFÄHIGER MATERIALIEN UND UNTER VERWENDUNG DAVON HERGESTELLTE ELEKTRODE UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2022/04] | English: | CONDUCTIVE MATERIAL DISPERSION, AND ELECTRODE AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY MANUFACTURED USING THE SAME | [2022/45] | French: | DISPERSION DE MATÉRIAU CONDUCTEUR, ET ÉLECTRODE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM PRODUITES À L'AIDE DE CELLE-CI | [2022/04] |
Former [2022/04] | CONDUCTIVE MATERIAL DISPERSION, AND ELECTRODE AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY PRODUCED USING SAME | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2021 | Translation filed | 19.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 11.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23151463.9 / EP4187649 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | IE | 12.05.2023 | LU | 12.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
IE | 12.05.2023 | ||
LU | 12.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 12.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 12.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
LU | 12.05.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 08.03.2023 | |
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 08.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012037853 (UNAGAMI RUNA [JP], et al); | [A]US2018175370 (KIM YE LIN [KR], et al); | [A]US2018277848 (MATSUMURA TAKU [JP], et al) | International search | [A]KR100852386B (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]); | [XY]KR20120021807 (HANWHA CHEMICAL CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20120079597 (FILMAX CORP [KR]); | [Y]KR20170069141 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20190037277 (DENKA COMPANY LTD [JP]) |