EP3970397 - A SENSOR DEVICE, A COMMUNICATION NODE, A SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING WHICH MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE IS CLOSEST TO A SENSOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shortcut Labs AB Drottning Kristinas Väg 41 114 28 Stockholm / SE | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WESTLUND PRÄNDEL, Joacim c/o Shortcut Labs AB Drottning Kristinas Väg 41 114 28 STOCKHOLM / SE | 02 /
MEIER, Anton c/o Shortcut Labs AB Drottning Kristinas Väg 41 114 28 STOCKHOLM / SE | 03 /
LENNGREN, Emil c/o Shortcut Labs AB Drottning Kristinas Väg 41 114 28 STOCKHOLM / SE | 04 /
ÖBERG, Oskar c/o Shortcut Labs AB Drottning Kristinas Väg 41 114 28 STOCKHOLM / SE | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Rouse AB P.O.Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Kitzler, Michael Rouse AB Docketing, PO Box 42 683 21 Hagfors / SE | Application number, filing date | 20809925.9 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020SE50506 | Priority number, date | SE20190050595 | 17.05.2019 Original published format: SE 1950595 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020236073 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970397 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/80, G06F3/048, H04W4/02, H04W4/06, H04W4/38 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H04W4/38 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,SE,US);
G06F3/048 (SE);
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04W4/027 (EP);
H04W4/06 (EP);
H04W4/90 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | H04W4/80, G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | SENSORVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSKNOTEN, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG, WELCHE MOBILE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG SICH AM NÄCHSTEN ZU EINER SENSORVORRICHTUNG BEFINDET | [2022/12] | English: | A SENSOR DEVICE, A COMMUNICATION NODE, A SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING WHICH MOBILE COMMUNICATION DEVICE IS CLOSEST TO A SENSOR DEVICE | [2022/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAPTEUR, NOEUD DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTERMINER QUEL DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE EST LE PLUS PROCHE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE CAPTEUR | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 24.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013217333 (SPRIGG STEPHEN A [US], et al); | [I]US2014279101 (DUPLAN LUCAS ANDREW [US], et al); | [I]EP2817651 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [I]WO2018117958 (CRUNCHFISH AB [SE]); | International search | [XA]US2014127999 (KANE BRITTIN [US], et al) [X] 1-8, 10-13, 15- 19, 21-23 * ; paragraphs [0035]-[0036]; figures 1C,1D,3A * [A] 9, 14, 20; | [DA]US9733808 (PESOLA JUUSO [FI], et al) [DA] 1-23* ; whole document *; | [A]US2018108078 (HOWELL DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-23 * ; abstract; figures 1,2 * |