EP3969171 - CHROMIUM-FREE, IRON-BASED CATALYST FOR WATER GAS SHIFT REACTION AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Triangle Institute 3040 East Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Jian-Ping 3040 East Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 02 /
TURK, Brian 7305 Calibre Park 204 Durham, NC 27707 / US | 03 /
SHARMA, Pradeepkumar 3040 East Cornwallis Road Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 04 /
DENTON, David 2274 Magnolia Meadows Drive Mt. Pleasant, SC 29464 / US | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Cameron Intellectual Property Ltd Moncrieff House 69 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20810183.2 | 22.04.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020US29217 | Priority number, date | US201962849251P | 17.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962849251 P | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020236381 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3969171 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/80, B01J35/00, B01J27/232, C01B3/16, C01B3/32, B01J37/00, B01J37/03 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
B01J35/613 (EP,IL,US);
B01J23/80 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C01B32/50 (US);
B01J19/0093 (US);
B01J23/745 (EP,IL);
B01J27/232 (KR);
B01J35/19 (KR);
B01J35/31 (EP,IL,US);
B01J37/0045 (EP);
B01J37/031 (EP);
B01J8/24 (US);
C01B3/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C01B3/32 (KR);
B01J2523/00 (EP);
C01B2203/0283 (KR,US);
C01B2203/1041 (KR);
C01B2203/1076 (KR);
C01B2203/1661 (KR);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/27, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/842 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | B01J23/80, B01J35/00, B01J27/232, C01B3/16, C01B3/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | CHROMFREIER, EISENBASIERTER KATALYSATOR FÜR WASSERGAS-SHIFT-REAKTION UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/12] | English: | CHROMIUM-FREE, IRON-BASED CATALYST FOR WATER GAS SHIFT REACTION AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2022/12] | French: | CATALYSEUR À BASE DE FER EXEMPT DE CHROME POUR RÉACTION DE CONVERSION DE GAZ D'EAU ET SES PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 16.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009152500 (CHEN CHAO [CN], et al) | International search | [Y]US5476877 (CLAVENNA LEROY R [US], et al); | [A]US7259286 (JOTHIMURUGESAN KANDASWAMY [US], et al); | [A]CN101518737 (UNIV SHANGHAI); | [Y]US7964114 (CHEN CHAO [CN], et al); | [A]US2013309165 (KOO KEE YOUNG [KR], et al) |