EP3973080 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING WHETHER A SUBJECT HAS A CANCER CONDITION USING TRANSFER LEARNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grail, Inc. 1525 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2024/35] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states Grail, LLC 1525 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHER, M., Cyrus c/o Grail, Inc. 1525 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/30] |
Former [2022/13] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20810838.1 | 22.05.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020US34317 | Priority number, date | US201962851486P | 22.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962851486 P | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020237184 | Date: | 26.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3973080 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3973080 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F18/2115, G06F18/213, C12Q1/6886, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6883, G16B30/00, G16B40/00, G16H50/20 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G06F18/2115 (EP,US);
G06F18/213 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (US);
G16H50/70 (US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | C12Q1/6886, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6883, G16B30/00, G16B40/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR FESTSTELLUNG, OB EIN INDIVIDUUM AN KREBS ERKRANKT IST, UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSLERNEN | [2022/13] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING WHETHER A SUBJECT HAS A CANCER CONDITION USING TRANSFER LEARNING | [2022/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTERMINER SI UN SUJET A UNE PATHOLOGIE CANCÉREUSE À L'AIDE D'UN APPRENTISSAGE PAR TRANSFERT | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 19.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24189902.0 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2019084559 (APOSTLE INC [US]); | [A]US2019130065 (LO YUK-MING DENNIS [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US2015299808 (GONZALEZ DIAZ HERNAN EUGENIO [CL], et al); | [A]WO2018009723 (GUARDANT HEALTH INC [US]); | [A]WO2019079166 (ILLUMINA INC [US]); | [A]WO2019084559 (APOSTLE INC [US]); | [A]US2019130065 (LO YUK-MING DENNIS [CN], et al); |