EP4064938 - CROSS BRACE AND MODULAR FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vitra AG Klünenfeldstrasse 22 4127 Birsfelden / CH | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLER, Stefan Bergstrasse 27 79585 Steinen - Hofen / DE | 02 /
SCHÜTT, Helmut Hadthof 1 79379 Mülllheim - Hügelheim / DE | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Grellingerstrasse 60 4052 Basel / CH | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20810976.9 | 25.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020EP83376 | Priority number, date | CH20190001485 | 25.11.2019 Original published format: CH 14852019 | [2022/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021105216 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064938 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47B87/00, A47B87/02, E04G7/34 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
A47B87/0207 (EP);
F16B12/10 (CH);
A47B47/028 (US);
A47B47/0058 (CH);
A47B47/0091 (CH);
A47B47/027 (US);
A47B57/38 (CH);
A47B87/001 (EP);
F16B7/048 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | WINDVERBAND UND MÖBELBAUSATZ | [2022/40] | English: | CROSS BRACE AND MODULAR FURNITURE | [2022/40] | French: | TRAVERSE ET MEUBLE MODULAIRE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 24.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2665950 (JOHNSON WALLACE J S) [Y] 14* column 1, line 14 - column 4, line 64; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]JP2008063841 (NIKKO KK, et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,13 * the whole document * [Y] 14; | [XYI]KR101239651B (D M C CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,13 * abstract * [Y] 14 [I] 10-12 | by applicant | EP0262090 |