Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023013163 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020EP83376 | 25.11.2020 | CH14852019 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4064938 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020EP83376 | 25.11.2020 | CH14852019 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021105216 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH14852019 | 25.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH716837 | 31.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH14852019 | 25.11.2019 |