EP4052621 - SYSTEMS AND PROCESSES FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES WITH ENHANCED DETECTION OF ACTUATION STATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novadelta - Comércio e Indústria de Cafés, Unipessoal Lda Av. Infante Dom Henrique 151 A 1950-041 Lisboa / PT | [2023/14] |
Former [2022/36] | For all designated states Novadelta-Comércio e Industria de Cafés, Lda. Av. Infante Dom Henrique 151 A 1950-041 Lisboa / PT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NABEIRO, Rui Miguel RUA DR. TELLO DA GAMA, Nº 89 7370-112 CAMPO MAIOR / PT | 02 /
MEDINA MUNDT, Jesús AV. CIDADE DE LUANDA LOTE 338, 2º ANDAR, PORTA 8 1800-098 LISBOA / PT | 03 /
DE BRITO LEÃO, João André RAMPA MONTE DA LUZ, Nº 64 TR 4400-508 VILA NOVA DE GAIA / PT | 04 /
GONÇALVES MARTINS, Marco Filipe ESTRADA REAL DONA MARIA, Nº 25 2480-093 PEDREIRAS / PT | 05 /
DE FIGUEIREDO BRANCO, João André AVENIDA CAPITÃO SALGUEIRO MAIA, Nº 1 - 1C 1885-091 MOSCAVIDE / PT | 06 /
DA SILVA FERROLHO MENDES, Tiago Rafael RUA ACADEMIA RECREATIVA DE SANTO AMARO, Nº 11 1300-001 LISBOA / PT | 07 /
ALEXANDRE CORREIA, Filipe RUA MANUEL FERNANDES BAPTISTA Nº 6 - 4º ANDAR 2640-813 MAFRA / PT | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Ferreira Pinto, Francisca Garrigues IP, Unipessoal Lda. Av. da República, 25-1° 1050-186 Lisboa / PT | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20811126.0 | 28.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020PT50037 | Priority number, date | PT20190115873 | 31.10.2019 Original published format: PT 2019115873 | [2022/36] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021086215 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | PT | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4052621 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/52 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
A47J31/525 (EP,US);
A47J31/4425 (US);
A47J31/468 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUBEREITUEN VON GETRÄNKEN MIT ERHÖHTER DETEKTION VON BETÄTIGUNGSZUSTÄNDEN | [2022/36] | English: | SYSTEMS AND PROCESSES FOR PREPARING BEVERAGES WITH ENHANCED DETECTION OF ACTUATION STATES | [2022/36] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSONS AVEC DÉTECTION AMÉLIORÉE D'ÉTATS D'ACTIONNEMENT | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2022 | Translation filed | 28.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 28.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2018189071 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 1-18 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 8 * * page 8, line 21 - page 10, line 11; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2019059639 (BRANKO LUKIC [US], et al) [X] 1-18* paragraphs 38,74 - page -, paragraph - *; | [X]US2019191916 (GUYON BERTRAND [FR], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs 36-39,65-67 - page -, paragraph - *; | [X]US2019282023 (NABEIRO RUI MIGUEL [PT]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs 12-20,65-68 - page -, paragraph - * |