EP4065279 - METHOD FOR DISPENSING A LIQUID SAMPLE BY MEANS OF A DISPENSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states cytena GmbH Neuer Messplatz 3 79108 Freiburg / DE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSS, Andre c/o cytena GmbH Neuer Messplatz 3 79108 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
RIBA, Julian c/o cytena GmbH Neuer Messplatz 3 79108 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
SCHÖNDUBE, Jonas c/o cytena GmbH Neuer Messplatz 3 79108 Freiburg / DE | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20811399.3 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020EP83662 | Priority number, date | LU20190101494 | 27.11.2019 Original published format: LU 101494 | [2022/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021105380 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065279 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
B01L3/0293 (EP);
G01N35/1016 (EP,US);
G01N15/10 (US);
B01L2200/061 (EP);
B01L2200/0652 (EP);
B01L2200/143 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DISPENSIEREN EINER FLÜSSIGEN PROBE MITTELS EINER DISPENSIEREINRICHTUNG | [2022/40] | English: | METHOD FOR DISPENSING A LIQUID SAMPLE BY MEANS OF A DISPENSING APPARATUS | [2022/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION D'UN ÉCHANTILLON LIQUIDE ET DISPOSITIF DISTRIBUTEUR | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 24.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/25] | 17.01.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/25] | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2015142378 (NAMOCELL LLC [US]) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0030] , [0056]; figure 2 *[A] 1-12,14-28; | [XA]US2017307502 (MASON CLARK [US], et al) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0164] , [0205] , [0206]; figure 2 * [A] 1-12,14-28; | [X]EP3453455 (SCIENION AG [DE]) [X] 1-28 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0020] , [0041] , [0051] - [0054] - [0072] , [0082] - [0087] - [0090] , [0092]; figures 1-10 *; | [XA]US2019151848 (NIELSEN JEFFREY A [US], et al) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] - [0054] - [0055]; figures 1-8 * [A] 1-12,14-28; | [XA]EP3561040 (CYTENA GMBH [DE]) [X] 13 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017]; figure 1 * [A] 1-12,14-28; | [XA]WO2019206476 (CYTENA GMBH [DE]) [X] 13 * page 13, line 8 - line 32; figure 1 * [A] 1-12,14-28 | by applicant | EP3222353 |