EP4065063 - COLLECTION DEVICE FOR COLLECTING AND SUCTIONING OFF MERCURY-LOADED AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zehm, Michael Fürholzstrasse 2 3780 Gstaad / CH | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20811411.6 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020EP83718 | Priority number, date | CH20190001507 | 28.11.2019 Original published format: CH 15072019 | [2022/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021105418 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065063 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4065063 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61G15/14, B01D53/64, A61M16/00 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
A61C17/065 (EP);
A61G15/14 (CH);
A61C17/08 (EP);
B01D53/04 (EP);
B01D53/64 (EP,CH);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2257/404 (EP);
B01D2257/602 (EP,CH);
B01D2257/91 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFFANGVORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFFANGEN UND ABSAUGEN VON QUECKSILBERBELASTETER LUFT | [2022/40] | English: | COLLECTION DEVICE FOR COLLECTING AND SUCTIONING OFF MERCURY-LOADED AIR | [2022/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE POUR COLLECTER ET ASPIRER DE L'AIR CHARGÉ DE MERCURE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 01.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | MC | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | LU | 27.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
IT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SK | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
LU | 27.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
LU | 27.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 01.11.2023 | |
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
LU | 27.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19503780 (JORDAN THOMAS WINFRIED DR [DE]) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2004010892 (UNIV NEW JERSEY MED [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * pages 1-8; figures 1, 2 * [I] 7-15; | [XI]US2013252524 (LAVENDER RICHARD JERALD [CA]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0038]; figures 1-3 * [I] 9,12-15 | by applicant | WO9400220 | EP0498782 | DE19503780 | DE10130721 |