EP4066059 - CHEMICALLY AMPLIFIED PHOTORESIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUDO, Takanori 70 Meister Avenue Branchburg, New Jersey 08876 / US | 02 /
YANG, Fan 70 Meister Avenue Branchburg, New Jersey 08876 / US | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Hans Christoph Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20811609.5 | 23.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020EP83048 | Priority number, date | US201962939741P | 25.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962939741 P | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021105054 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4066059 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4066059 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/022, G03F7/023, G03F7/039 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
G03F7/0226 (EP,KR);
G03F7/022 (EP,KR);
G03F7/0392 (EP,US);
G03F7/0045 (US);
G03F7/0233 (EP,US);
G03F7/0236 (EP,KR);
H01L21/0274 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHEMISCH VERSTÄRKTER FOTOLACK | [2022/40] | English: | CHEMICALLY AMPLIFIED PHOTORESIST | [2022/40] | French: | RÉSINE PHOTOSENSIBLE AMPLIFIÉE CHIMIQUEMENT | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 22.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0962825 (KANSAI RESEARCH INST KRI [JP]) [A] 1-23* paragraphs [0001] , [0 20] - [0040] - [0 49] - [0051] - [0 57]; examples 1-12; claims 1-3, 7 *; | [A]US2003134223 (KATANO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 20] - [0030] - [ 140]; examples 1-5; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US2005244740 (MARUYAMA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 12] - [0026]; examples 1-8; claims 1-22 *; | [A]US2009081589 (TOUKHY MEDHAT A [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * Resist Examples 1 to 9; paragraphs [0001] , [00 6] , [00 7] , [0 95] - [0097]; examples 1-7; claims 1-19 *; | [A]US2013330669 (KAWAMURA MAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * Synthesis Example 3; paragraphs [0209] , [ 213] - [0223]; examples 8, 12, 15; claims 1-14 *; | [A]WO2018029142 (AZ ELECTRONIC MAT LUXEMBOURG SARL [LU]) [A] 1-23 * formulations 1, 1a, 2; paragraphs [0001] , [0 12] - [0017] - [ 116] - [0151]; examples 1-8; claims 1-21; table 1 * | by applicant | US5069997 | US2002001769 | JP2008046594 |