Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4061405 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2020385683 CA3161800 CN202080093524 EP20811745 IB2020060713 IL29305122 JP2022528540 KR20227020578 US202017097458 US202418663981



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024294884Global Dossier 05.09.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202017097458 13.11.2020
US202418663981 14.05.2024
US201962936841 18.11.2019
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12018289Global Dossier 25.06.2024B2
US2021222133 22.07.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202017097458 13.11.2020
US201962936841 18.11.2019
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20220115569Global Dossier 17.08.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP7630507BGlobal Dossier 17.02.2025B2
JP2023509571 09.03.2023A
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL293051Global Dossier 01.07.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN114980920Global Dossier 30.08.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3161800Global Dossier 27.05.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2020385683Global Dossier 30.06.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4061405Global Dossier 28.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR120492 16.02.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112022009598 16.08.2022A2
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CO2022008493 08.07.2022A2
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CR20220220 20.09.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DOP2022000103 30.11.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JOP20220116 30.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2022005980 07.09.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PE20221182 05.08.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PH12022551208 24.04.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
WO2020IB60713 13.11.2020
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2021099906Global Dossier 27.05.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CL2022001298 13.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ECSP22048779 29.07.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW202120533 01.06.2021A
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
US201962936846 18.11.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
UY38961 31.05.2021A
Priority number Date
US201962936841 18.11.2019
US201962936846 18.11.2019