EP3979351 - QUANTUM DOT ELECTROLUMINESCENT COMPONENT, MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO., LTD. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEI, Wenhai No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Zhenqi No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Aidi No. 9 Dize Rd., BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20811955.2 | 30.03.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020CN82134 | Priority number, date | CN201910473116 | 31.05.2019 Original published format: CN201910473116 | [2022/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020238390 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3979351 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10K50/115 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H10K50/115 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/16 (EP,US);
G09F9/33 (CN);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K85/40 (US);
H10K85/761 (US);
G03F7/162 (US);
G03F7/168 (US);
H10K2102/321 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/14] | H01L51/50, H01L51/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE QUANTENPUNKT-KOMPONENTE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/14] | English: | QUANTUM DOT ELECTROLUMINESCENT COMPONENT, MANUFACTURING METHOD, AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2022/14] | French: | COMPOSANT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT À POINTS QUANTIQUES, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2020 | Translation filed | 03.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 19.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010308369 (GLEASON KAREN K [US], et al); | [XI]US2018108841 (LI YANZHAO [CN], et al) | International search | [Y]US2009087792 (IIZUMI YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]CN105140370 (TCL GROUP CO LTD); | [A]CN108807720 (TCL CORP); | [A]CN109216567 (TCL CORP); | [A]CN109216566 (TCL CORP); | [A]CN109326729 (TCL CORP); | [Y]CN109390476 (TCL CORP) |