Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.04.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
28.04.2023 | Change - classification | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
28.04.2023 | Change - classification | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
24.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.08.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
05.08.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.03.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
04.03.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
15.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.12.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
05.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
04.12.2020 | Change - representative | |
04.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication |