Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.08.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
10.02.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
10.02.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.09.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
09.09.2022 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
09.09.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
16.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.07.2022 | Change - representative | |
06.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.07.2022 | Change - representative | |
05.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.06.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
04.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication |