EP4070547 - SCALING PROCESS FOR JOINT CHROMA CODED BLOCKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings, SAS 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2023/36] |
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings France, SAS 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson-Sevigne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LAGRANGE, Philippe c/o Interdigital 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | 02 /
LELEANNEC, Fabrice c/o Interdigital 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | 03 /
FRANCOIS, Edouard c/o Interdigital 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | 04 /
BORDES, Philippe c/o Interdigital 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 CESSON-SEVIGNE / FR | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Rittner, Karsten Rittner & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Schiffgraben 17 30159 Hannover / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20812087.3 | 01.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020EP84021 | Priority number, date | EP20190306586 | 06.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19306586 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110628 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070547 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/126, H04N19/176, H04N19/186, H04N19/70, H04N19/85 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
H04N19/126 (EP);
H04N19/60 (US);
H04N19/12 (US);
H04N19/124 (US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | SKALIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR GEMEINSAME CHROMA-CODIERTE BLÖCKE | [2022/41] | English: | SCALING PROCESS FOR JOINT CHROMA CODED BLOCKS | [2022/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE À L'ÉCHELLE POUR BLOCS CODÉS DE CHROMINANCE CONJOINTE | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 04.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |