EP3906750 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING A SECONDARY CELL GROUP (SCG) IN A DUAL CONNECTIVITY (DC) MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATI, Dibyajyoti 2870, Orion Building, Bagmane Constellation Business Park, Outer Ring Road, Doddanekundi Circle, Marathahalli Post Bangalore 560037 / IN | 02 /
EDA, Raja Moses Manoj Kumar 2870, Orion Building, Bagmane Constellation Business Park, Outer Ring Road, Doddanekundi Circle, Marathahalli Post Bangalore 560037 / IN | 03 /
PANDEY, Surendra 2870, Orion Building, Bagmane Constellation Business Park, Outer Ring Road, Doddanekundi Circle, Marathahalli Post Bangalore 560037 / IN | [2024/16] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
PATI, Dibyajyoti Bangalore 560037 / IN | ||
02 /
EDA, Raja Moses Manoj Kumar Bangalore 560037 / IN | |||
03 /
PANDEY, Surendra Bangalore 560037 / IN | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 20812731.6 | 29.05.2020 | [2021/45] | WO2020KR06973 | Priority number, date | IN201941021794 | 31.05.2019 Original published format: IN201941021794 | IN201941021794 | 24.05.2020 Original published format: IN201941021794 | [2021/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020242240 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3906750 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3906750 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/327, H04W24/10, H04W76/15, H04W76/34, // H04W76/18 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
H04W76/34 (EP);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04B17/318 (US);
H04B17/327 (EP);
H04B17/336 (US);
H04L1/203 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W76/18 (EP,US);
H04W76/30 (US);
H04W84/18 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | H04W76/15, H04W76/18, H04W76/30, H04W24/08, H04W88/06, H04B17/327, H04W24/10, H04W76/34 | ||
Former IPC [2021/45] | H04W76/15, H04W76/18, H04W76/30, H04W24/08, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONFIGURATION EINER SEKUNDÄRZELLENGRUPPE (SCG) IN EINEM MODUS MIT DUALEM KONNEKTIVITÄT (DC) | [2021/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING A SECONDARY CELL GROUP (SCG) IN A DUAL CONNECTIVITY (DC) MODE | [2021/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE CONFIGURER UN GROUPE DE CELLULES SECONDAIRES (SCG) DANS UN MODE DE CONNECTIVITÉ DOUBLE (DC) | [2021/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 25.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2019066707 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | International search | [YX]US2017164419 (KIM JAE HEUNG [KR]) [Y] 4,6 [X] 1-3,5,7-12; | [A]US2018035346 (FUJISHIRO MASATO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12; | [A]US2018270713 (PARK KYUNGMIN [US], et al)[A] 1-12; | [Y]US2018352601 (PARK HYUN SEO [KR], et al) [Y] 4,6; | [A]US2019014529 (KARAMPATSIS DIMITRIOS [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 | by applicant | WO2019066707 |