EP3978277 - TIRE TESTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kokusai Keisokuki Kabushiki Kaisha 21-1 Nagayama 6-chome Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Sigeru c/o KOKUSAI KEISOKUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 21-1, Nagayama 6-chome Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | 02 /
MIYASHITA, Hiroshi c/o KOKUSAI KEISOKUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 21-1, Nagayama 6-chome Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | 03 /
MURAUCHI, Kazuhiro c/o KOKUSAI KEISOKUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 21-1, Nagayama 6-chome Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | 04 /
TOKITA, Shuichi c/o KOKUSAI KEISOKUKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 21-1, Nagayama 6-chome Tama-shi, Tokyo 206-0025 / JP | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/14] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Lewis Silkin LLP 5 Chancery Lane Clifford's Inn London EC4A 1BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20813392.6 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020JP19526 | Priority number, date | JP20190098135 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019098135 | [2022/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020241323 | Date: | 03.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3978277 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60C19/00, G01M17/02 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G01M17/021 (EP,US);
G01M17/02 (KR,US);
B60C19/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | REIFENPRÜFVORRICHTUNG | [2022/14] | English: | TIRE TESTING DEVICE | [2022/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ESSAI DE PNEUMATIQUE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2021 | Translation filed | 19.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 20.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4662211 (STRONG JAMES W [US]); | [A]JP2013156087 (BRIDGESTONE CORP, et al) | International search | [YA]WO2012141170 (KOKUSAI KEISOKUKI KK [JP], et al); | [XYA]JP2013156087 (BRIDGESTONE CORP, et al); | [YA]JP2017008989 (JTEKT CORP) | by applicant | JP2016080414 |